United States of America v. ONE 2015 MASERATI QUATTROPORTE VIN: ZAM56RRA4F1144590
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: ONE 2015 MASERATI QUATTROPORTE VIN: ZAM56RRA4F1144590
Case Number: 1:2022cv00759
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date November 5, 2022. (Kennedy, James)
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 WARRANT Returned executed as to ONE 2015 MASERATI QUATTROPORTE VIN: ZAM56RRA4F1144590. (SG)
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kennedy, James)
October 7, 2022 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 1/18/2023 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. William M. Skretny. (TMK)
October 7, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
October 7, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Kennedy, Jr on behalf of United States of America (Kennedy, James)
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Civil Forfeiture against ONE 2015 MASERATI QUATTROPORTE VIN: ZAM56RRA4F1144590, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrant, #3 Request for Arrest Warrant in Rem Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. ONE 2015 MASERATI QUATTROPORTE VIN: ZAM56RRA4F1144590
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James P. Kennedy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2015 MASERATI QUATTROPORTE VIN: ZAM56RRA4F1144590
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?