Zielinski v. Annucci
Plaintiff: Jeremy Zielinski
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Case Number: 1:2022cv00924
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Zielinski. (JLV)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of Anthony Annucci against Jeremy Zielinski. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 12/14/2022. (JLV) This was mailed to: Jeremy Zielinski.
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee; that the Clerk of Court shall send to the plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation; that if plaintiff wishes to reopen his action, he shall notify this Court, in writing, no later than 30 days from the date of this order; that the writing should include either (a) a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification from the plaintiff's inmate trust account fund and authorization form or (b) the $350.00 filing fee and the $52.00 administrative fee ($402.00 total); that upon plaintiff's submission of either (a) a complete motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification and authorization form, or (b) the $350.00 filing fee and the $52.00 administrative fee ($402.00 total), the Clerk of the Court shall reopen this case. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/14/2022. (JLV) This was mailed to: Jeremy Zielinski along with a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis and authorization.
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Zielinski. (JLV)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Annucci filed by Jeremy Zielinski. (JLV)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and a civil case timeline. (JLV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zielinski v. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?