Sawyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dawn M Sawyer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv00628
Filed: June 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to file the certified administrative transcript - Commissioner of Social Security answer due 9/27/2023. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/25/23. (NNR)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Molinaro, John)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Molinaro on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Molinaro, John)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE regarding service of #1 Complaint, in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 8/28/2023.Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (CGJ)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (CGJ)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4911828, filed by Dawn M Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 WITHDRAWL OF CONSENT OF MAGISTRATE)(Comerford, Ida)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M Sawyer
Represented By: Ida M. Comerford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John Thomas Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?