Forde v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bruce Forde
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv00092
Filed: January 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Commissioner of Social Security answer due 4/24/2024. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/22/24. (NNR)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Commissioner of Social Security.(Molinaro, John)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Molinaro on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Molinaro, John)
January 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5089891, filed by Bruce Forde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT OF MAGISTRATE)(Comerford, Ida)
January 25, 2024 NOTICE regarding service of #1 Complaint, in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 3/25/2024.Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (TMK)
January 25, 2024 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (TMK)
January 25, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forde v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Forde
Represented By: Ida M. Comerford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John Thomas Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?