GRAY et al v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: Reginald A. Gray and Onyinye Patience Onhanma Gray
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and Merrick B Garland
Case Number: 1:2024cv00582
Filed: June 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:24-cv-00870.
June 21, 2024 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov. Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(CGJ)
June 21, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend #8 and TRANSFERRING this case to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 06/10/2024. (lclla3) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
June 10, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Defendants' Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend #8 . Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 06/10/2024. (lclla3) Modified on 6/12/2024 to update document type (zcdw). [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
May 24, 2024 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (McBride, Patricia). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 5/28/2024 (znmw). [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
May 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/29/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/28/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/08/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 4/5/2024; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 4/5/2024 (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 ERRATA by REGINALD A. GRAY, ONYINYE PATIENCE ONHANMA GRAY. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
March 28, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. (znmw) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]
March 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10782749) filed by REGINALD A. GRAY, ONYINYE PATIENCE ONHANMA GRAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Summons SUMMONS FOR U.S. ATTORNEY, #3 Summons SUMMONS FOR ATTORNEY GENERAL, #4 Summons SUMMONS FOR ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, #5 Summons SUMMONS FOR UR M. JADDOU, #6 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 6/21/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY et al v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald A. Gray
Represented By: Sadaf F. Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onyinye Patience Onhanma Gray
Represented By: Sadaf F. Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?