Windsor Venture Corp. et al v. Agricultural Logistics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc., Windsor Venture Corp., Freight Hub Corp. and Sunship Inc.
Defendant: Matthew Gorka, Agricultural Logistics LLC, Jacob Sam and Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00688
Filed: July 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Nicholas P. Lacey ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5286424.) by Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Pro Hac Vice Admission Package, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stein, Deana)
September 20, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for John C. Gentile ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5286416.) by Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Pro Hac Vice Admission Package, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stein, Deana)
September 20, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Eric Larson Zalud ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5286360.) by Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 Pro Hac Vice Admission Package, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stein, Deana)
September 16, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stein, Deana)
August 15, 2024 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting the defendants' motion, Docket Item #8 , for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. Response due by 9/16/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/15/2024. (DJ)
August 14, 2024 Filing 9 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam. to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Defendants' Notice of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam. (Stein, Deana)
August 14, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam.(Stein, Deana)
August 13, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc., Freight Hub Corp., Sunship Inc., Windsor Venture Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Go Hub.io Holdings Corp. for Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc., Freight Hub Corp., Sunship Inc... (Attachments: #1 Business Organizations Party Disclosures)(Lin, David)
August 12, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jacob Esau Sam on 08/09/2024, filed by Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc., Freight Hub Corp., Sunship Inc., Windsor Venture Corp.. (Lin, David)
August 7, 2024 ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
July 29, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Agricultural Transport Payroll Inc. on 7/25/2024, filed by Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc., Freight Hub Corp., Sunship Inc., Windsor Venture Corp.. (Lin, David)
July 29, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Agricultural Logistics LLC on 07/25/2024, filed by Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc., Freight Hub Corp., Sunship Inc., Windsor Venture Corp.. (Lin, David)
July 29, 2024 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Matthew Gorka on 7/25/2024, filed by Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc., Freight Hub Corp., Sunship Inc., Windsor Venture Corp.. (Lin, David)
July 24, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam. (TMK)
July 24, 2024 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
July 24, 2024 Filing fee paid twice. Please refer to refund policy located on our website: www.nywd.uscourts.gov (TMK)
July 24, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 24, 2024 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov. Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
July 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Agricultural Logistics LLC, Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., Matthew Gorka, Jacob Sam $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5238316, filed by Sunship Inc., Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc., Freight Hub Corp., Windsor Venture Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Agricultural Logistics LLC, #3 Proposed Summons to Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons to Jacob Sam, #5 Proposed Summons to Matthew Gorka)(Lin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windsor Venture Corp. et al v. Agricultural Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asset Co. Freight Brokers Inc.
Represented By: David D. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windsor Venture Corp.
Represented By: David D. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freight Hub Corp.
Represented By: David D. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunship Inc.
Represented By: David D. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gorka
Represented By: Deana S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agricultural Logistics LLC
Represented By: Deana S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Sam
Represented By: Deana S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agricultural Transport Payroll, Inc.
Represented By: Deana S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?