Gurski v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Gurski
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Safari Niyonshuti and Pep Boys
Cross-Complainant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Pep Boys and Safari Niyonshuti
Cross-Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Pep Boys and Safari Niyonshuti
Case Number: 1:2024cv00913
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2024 Filing 16 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Anthony Gurski(Wolff, David)
November 20, 2024 Filing 15 DISCOVERY PLAN by Anthony Gurski.(Wolff, David)
November 12, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of defendants Schneider National Carriers, Inc. and Safari Niyonshuti by Pep Boys.(Fegan, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Telephonic pretrial conference set for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. To access the conference, the parties shall dial (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 1533000# sufficiently in advance of the conference. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/29/2024. (JD)
October 28, 2024 Filing 12 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/28/2024. (CRT)
October 23, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Pep Boys by Safari Niyonshuti, Schneider National Carriers, Inc..(Schechter, Joel)
October 8, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim ANSWER TO CO-DEFENDANT PEP BOYS' CROSS CLAIM by Schneider National Carriers, Inc..(Schechter, Joel)
October 8, 2024 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc. for Schneider National Carriers, Inc... (Schechter, Joel)
October 8, 2024 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The stipulation for an extension of time for defendant Schneider National Carriers, Inc. ("Schneider"), to answer filed by the defendant, Docket Item #7 , is ordered. Answer due by 30 days after the date of service of process upon defendant Safari Niyonshuti. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/8/2024. (CRT)
October 7, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Schechter, Joel)
October 3, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Safari Niyonshuti, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. by Pep Boys.(Kevane, Timothy)
October 3, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal by Pep Boys. (Kevane, Timothy)
October 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel B. Schechter on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Schechter, Joel)
September 30, 2024 ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
September 30, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
September 30, 2024 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov. Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
September 30, 2024 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pep Boys -- Manny, Moe & Jack of Delaware, LLC. (Kevane, Timothy)
September 27, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pep Boys -- Manny, Moe & Jack of Delaware, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack LLC for Pep Boys -- Manny, Moe & Jack of Delaware, LLC.. (Kevane, Timothy)
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pep Boys -- Manny, Moe & Jack of Delaware, LLC from New York Supreme Court, County of Erie, case number 812361/2024. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5291878), filed by Pep Boys -- Manny, Moe & Jack of Delaware, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service for Complaint, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Emily Northrip, #4 Exhibit Amount in Controversy Email, #5 Exhibit Index Identifying Each Document Filed, #6 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kevane, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurski v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safari Niyonshuti
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys
Represented By: Timothy D. Kevane
Represented By: Jeffrey Clifford Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gurski
Represented By: David J. Wolff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: Pep Boys
Represented By: Timothy D. Kevane
Represented By: Jeffrey Clifford Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: Safari Niyonshuti
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Pep Boys
Represented By: Timothy D. Kevane
Represented By: Jeffrey Clifford Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Safari Niyonshuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?