United States of America v. American Diesel Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: American Diesel Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00052
Filed: January 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 USA Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. American Diesel Transport, Inc. served on 2/25/2025, answer due 3/18/2025. (Sooy, Thomas)
January 15, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Diesel Transport, Inc. (SG)
January 15, 2025 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
January 15, 2025 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
January 15, 2025 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov. Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(SG)
January 14, 2025 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Sooy, Thomas)
January 14, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Diesel Transport, Inc., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Claim and Statement of Charges, #2 Exhibit Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Indebtedness, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sooy, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. American Diesel Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Diesel Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?