Robinson v. Artus
Case Number: 6:2005cv06199
Filed: April 28, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
Presiding Judge: David G. Larimer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER finding no basis to alter or amend prior decision 27 re 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as Lenell Robinson and also adhering to prior Decision and Order denying certificate of appealability. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/11/10. (EMA)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 26 Report and Recommendations. The petition of Lenell Robinson for a writ of habeas corpus is in all respects denied and the petition is dismissed. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 12/11/09. (RE)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lenell Robinson. Objections due ten days from receipt. Signed by Hon. Victor E. Bianchini on 10/13/2009. (SDW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Artus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?