Barnes v. Fedele et al
Plaintiff: Arrello Barnes
Defendant: Fedele, Furman, Murphy, Kerbein, T. Stanley, Howard Matasar, Chappius, Jr, A. Barlett, P. Corcoran, M. McGinnis, Napoli, Everette, Litwilder, John Nuttail, Brian Fisher and Thomas Eagen
Case Number: 6:2007cv06197
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: David G. Larimer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's motion for relief under Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) 208 is denied. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/10/2019. Copy of this Decision and Order sent by First Class Mail to plaintiff Arrello Barnes on 1/10/2019 to his address of record. (KAH)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 DECISION AND ORDER Defendants' motion for summary judgment 194 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 199 is denied. The complaint is dismissed. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 10/2/2018. Copy of this Decision and Order sent by First Class Mail to plaintiff Arrello Barnes to his address of record. (KAH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying plaintiff's 156 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 4/10/13. (EMA)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 131 Motion for Reconsideration re 89 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 3/23/12. (EMA)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting in part and denying in part motion to dismiss filed by defendants Bartlett, Chappius, Eagen, Fedele, Fisher, Kerbein, McGinnis, Napoli, Nuttail, and Stanley 19 . Plaintiff's claims against those defendants in their official capa cities are dismissed, to the extent that plaintiff seeks to recover damages from those defendants. To the extent that the complaint can be read as asserting an Eighth Amendment "failure to protect" claim against those defendants, such clai ms are also dismissed. Plaintiff's equal protection and due process claims against those defendants are dismissed in their entirety. All of plaintiffs claims against defendants Kerbein, Fischer, McGinnis, Napoli, Eagen, Corcoran, and Matasar a re dismissed. In all other respects, the motion is denied. The motion to dismiss filed by defendant Corcoran 33 is granted, and plaintiff's claims against Corcoran are dismissed.The motion to dismiss filed by defendant Matasar 39 is granted , and plaintiff's claims against Matasar are dismissed. The motion to dismiss filed by defendant Murphy 56 is granted, and plaintiff's failure-to-protect, equal protection, and due process claims against Murphy, and all his claims against Murphy in Murphy's official capacity, are dismissed. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/13/11. (EMA)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying plaintiff's 81 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 10/25/10. (EMA)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying plaintiff's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 8/25/10. (EMA)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that the Court directs plaintiff and defendants to submit, no later than 6/11/10, any additional materials pertinent to defendants motions 19 33 39 56 in accordance with Rule 56(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 56.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for this district. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 5/3/10. (EMA)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying plaintiff's 32 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff must respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss on or before 4/1/09. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 2/25/09. (EMA)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECISION AND ORDER re 22 DECISION AND ORDER, extending time 120 days from entry of this Order for service of Defendants Furman and Matasar, please refer to Order for details. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 2/4/09. (RE)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECISION AND ORDER directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to DOCS' Counsel's Office. The Attorney General of the State of New York is directed to respond to this Order by 3/4/09. Time in which to serve the remaining defendants is extended 120 days from the date on which the Attorney General provides the requested information. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 1/29/09. (RE)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/9/09. (RE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Fedele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrello Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Matasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chappius, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Barlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litwilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nuttail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Eagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?