Canandaigua Emergency Squad, Inc. et al v. Rochester Area Health Maintenance Organization, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Canandaigua Emergency Squad, Inc., The Penfield Volunteer Emergency Ambulance Service, Inc., Northeast Quadrant Advanced Life Support, Inc., Chili Volunteer Ambulance Service, Inc. and Village of Macedon
Defendant: Rochester Area Health Maintenance Organization, Inc. and MVP Health Care, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2009cv06027
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Contract: Recovery Medicare Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Presiding Judge: Marian W. Payson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER remanding this case to New York State Supreme Court, Monroe County. ***CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/6/11. (EMA)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 34 First MOTION for Summary Judgment in favor of Plaintiff's on Issue of Liability filed by Canandaigua Emergency Squad, Inc., 37 First MOTION for Summary Judgment to Dismiss Complaint and Judgment Against Plaintiffs filed by MVP Health Care, Inc., Rochester Area Health Maintenance Organization, Inc. Responses due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/20/10. (PR)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER for reasons stated by the Court at the hearing on 2/18/09, plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is denied. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 2/23/09. (RE)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Argument on plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order/preliminary injunction is scheduled for 2/12/09 at 3:00 p.m. On or before 1/30/09, plaintiff must take steps to conform the papers to Rule 65, Local Rules of the Western District of New York. If plaintiffs object to removal, they should indicate the basis for that objection. Defendants responding papers must be filed on or before 2/9/09. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/23/09. (EMA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canandaigua Emergency Squad, Inc. et al v. Rochester Area Health Maintenance Organization, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canandaigua Emergency Squad, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley M. Pinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Penfield Volunteer Emergency Ambulance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley M. Pinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeast Quadrant Advanced Life Support, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley M. Pinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chili Volunteer Ambulance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley M. Pinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Macedon
Represented By: Bradley M. Pinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Area Health Maintenance Organization, Inc.
Represented By: Laurie A. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Laurie A. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?