Malik v. Skelly et al
Plaintiff: Sultan Malik
Defendant: Craig L. Skelly, Randy Banks, Shawn D. Pierson, Timothy J. Hable, Joel R. Ayers, Sean F. Davis and David Napoli
Case Number: 6:2009cv06283
Filed: June 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's attorney fee and costs applications (ECF No. 108) are GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $124,904.30 in attorney fees (645.5 attorney hours at $193.50 per hour plus 187 paralegal hou rs at $100 per hour), $2,638.56 in costs, and pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(d)(2), Plaintiff shall utilize 1% of the jury verdict amount, or $4,000, towards satisfaction of the attorney fee award. The remaining balance of $120,904.30 in attorney fees is payable by Defendants, and is due to Plaintiff's counsel immediately. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/29/17. (SCE)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECISION AND ORDER DENYING 39 Defendant David Napoli's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint against him. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 09/23/2013. (ST)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECISION AND ORDER denying 6 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 8 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/25/10. (KAP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malik v. Skelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sultan Malik
Represented By: Edward Sivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig L. Skelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn D. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Hable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel R. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean F. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?