Alster v. Fischer et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Alster
Defendant: Brain Fischer, John B. Lempke, Sheryl Zenzen, Rabbi Max, State of New York, Kenneth Pearlman and T. Meeker FSA, II
Case Number: 6:2009cv06510
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Seneca
Presiding Judge: Marian W. Payson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DECISION AND ORDER defendants' motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status and to relieve plaintiff's counsel of the duty to represent him pro bono 87 is denied. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 2/8/2018. (KAH)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants motion for partial summary judgment [#79] is granted in part and denied in part, as follows. Any claims for money damages against Defendants in the ir official capacities are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. All other claims in the Amended Complaint are dismissed, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) for failure to exhaust administrative remedies, except the following: First Amendment free exercise claims based upon the denial of communal celebrations of Jewish Sabbaths and holy days; the exclusion of Plaintiff from Jewish group events; and the lack of Jewish worship space. With regard to these exhausted claims, Fischer , Perlman and Meeker are entitled to summary judgment due to lack of personal involvement. The Clerk is directed to terminate Fischer, Perlman and Meeker as defendants. The exhausted claims may go forward as against Lempke, Zenzen and Rabbi Max. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/20/17. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECISION ORDER denying 65 Alster's Motion. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 7/2/2014. (KAH) (Main Document 75 replaced on 7/2/2014) (KAH).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alster v. Fischer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Alster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brain Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Lempke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Zenzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbi Max
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Meeker FSA, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?