Marshall v. MacKenzie et al
Plaintiff: Conrad Marshall
Defendant: Andrew MacKenzie and Hoang Kavanaugh
Case Number: 6:2010cv06143
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
Presiding Judge: Marian W. Payson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 2/18/2010. (KER)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECISION AND ORDER denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on November 19, 2009. (APG)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on October 19, 2009. (APG)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on May 7, 2009. (APG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. MacKenzie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew MacKenzie
Represented By: Igor Shukoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoang Kavanaugh
Represented By: Igor Shukoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?