McKnight v. City of Rochester, New York et al
Plaintiff: Miriam McKnight
Defendant: City of Rochester, New York, G. Vasil, M. Nicholls and L. Grande
Case Number: 6:2011cv06328
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DECISION AND ORDER I find that an award of compensatory damages is warranted, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment for plaintiff Miriam McKnight against defendant Gregory Vasile in the total amount of $191,000 ($190,000 for her emotional and deprivation of liberty injuries and $1,000 for her compensable physical injuries) with prejudgment interest to be awarded at the rate of 9% per annum from March 30, 2017, through the entry of this judgment, with any post-judgment interest to be calculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. I further find that punitive damages are not justified. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 9/27/2018. (KAH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DECISION AND ORDER For the reasons stated within the Decision & Order, judgment shall be awarded in favor of McKnight on her claims against Vasile for false arrest, false imprisonment, and battery. Judgment shall be awarded in favor of defendants on all other counts. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to enter judgment accordingly. Plaintiff shall file her memorandum of law on the question of damages by no later than 4/24/2017; defendant Vasile shall file his by no later than 5/8/2017. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/30/2017. (KAH) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECISION & ORDER McKnight's motion seeking judgment in her favor on her claim against the City for negligent hiring, training and supervision 41 is denied, the City's cross-motion for summary judgment dismissing McKnight's claim for negligent hiring, training and supervision 46 is granted, and the claim is dismissed with prejudice. A pretrial conference will be held before the Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/24/2015 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/30/2015. (KAH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKnight v. City of Rochester, New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam McKnight
Represented By: E. Robert Fussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rochester, New York
Represented By: Spencer L. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Vasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Nicholls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?