Byfield v. Chapman et al
Plaintiff: Donovan Byfield
Defendant: Chapman, Shope, Dorda, Cox, Donaldson, Vaughn, Clark, Sickler, John Doe (1), John Doe (2) and John Doe (3)
Case Number: 6:2012cv06131
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jonathan W. Feldman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 64 Motion. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 06/13/2016. A copy of this decision and order has been sent to Plaintiff via US mail at Auburn Correctional Facility, Box 618, Auburn, NY 13021. (ZS)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECISION AND ORDER denying 55 Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/03/2015. Pro se Plaintiff, at the Auburn C.F., is hereby being sent this NEF and docketed Decision and Order. (ST)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECISION AND ORDER denying Defendants' Motion in Limine, found within 48 Defendants' Proposed Voir Dire. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/22/2015. Pro se Plaintiff, at the Auburn C.F., is hereby being sent this NEF and docketed Decision and Order. (ST)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying without prejudice to renew 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 9/24/2013. Within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order, Directive 4944 shall be produced by Defendants, to plaintiff. (RJO)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the AG assist in ascertaining the full names of the John Doe defendants by 7/6/2012; Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order and the Complaint to Debra Martin, Esq. AAG, Rochester, NY; Court grants an extension of time to serve complaint for a period of 120 days from the date of this order. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 6/11/2012. (TO)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; The Clerk of the Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers,and to cause the United States Marshal to serve copies of the Summons, Complaint, and this Order upon the named defendants. (Sent plaintiff summonses and marshal forms to fill out and return for service). Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 3/22/2012. (TO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byfield v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Byfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?