Brooks v. Mullen et al
Plaintiff: Marian Brooks
Defendant: Gregory L Mullen, Kerie Causer and Reinbold
Case Number: 6:2014cv06690
Filed: December 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Steuben
Presiding Judge: Frank P. Geraci
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DECISION AND ORDER: Based on the credible testimony at the evidentiary hearing, see ECF No. 95 , the Court concludes that Defendants have met their burden of proof on their affirmative defense that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrati ve remedies as required by the PLRA. Plaintiff has not established that those administrative remedies are unavailable to him. Therefore, the Complaint is DISMISSED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/21/2020. Order and NEF mailed to pro se Plaintiff.(BJJ)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case.
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DECISION AND ORDER denying 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 5/15/2020. (BJJ) A copy of this NEF and Decision were mailed to pro se Plaintiff.
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECISION AND ORDER denying 66 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/9/20. Order and NEF mailed to pro se Plaintiff.(BJJ)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 42 44 Motions to Appoint Counsel are DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/18/2019. A copy of this NEF and Decision and Order have been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. (AFM)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED. A copy of this NEF and Decision and Order have been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/15/2017. (AFM)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECISION AND ORDER denying 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel. SO ORDERED. A copy of this NEF and Order have been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/22/2017. (AFM)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ORDER and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 13 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Moreover, due to Defendants' failure to answer the Complaint in this matter, all Defendants are ordered to show cause in wri ting by October 30, 2017 why entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) or default judgment pursuant to Rule 55(b) should not be entered against them. SO ORDERED. A Copy of this NEF and Order have been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff, Defendant Mullen, Defendant Reinbold, Defendant Causer, and the Rochester Attorney General's Office. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/27/2017. (AFM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Mullen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerie Causer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reinbold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?