Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund et al v. Flower City Monitors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund and Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435
Defendant: Flower City Monitors, Inc. and Lenora L. Paige
Case Number: 6:2015cv06446
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Strike. The parties are strongly encouraged to consent to a magistrate judge exercising the Courts full jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1) over all issues remaining in this case. The parties are directe d to return the completed consent forms to the Clerk of Court by Monday, July 23, 2018. If the parties do not avail themselves of this opportunity to expedite resolution of the damages question, the Court will issue a separate order referring this matter to a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) to hear and report on damages. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 7/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms) (LB)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Default Judgment consistent with this Decision and Order and denying without prejudice Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint to Conform to the Proof.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 7/26/17. (JMC)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECISION AND ORDER denying 16 Motion to Vacate the Clerk's entry of a notice of default. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 7/18/17. (JMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund et al v. Flower City Monitors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers Annuity Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flower City Monitors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenora L. Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?