Robinson et al v. Lynch et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Kubow, Kenneth E. Mathison, Harold W. Schroeder, William R. Fox, Sr., William Robinson, Michael Carpinelli, George Curbelo, Jr., Leslie H. Wilson, Michael Mastrogiovanni, Don Hey, Mattie D. Zarpentine, Larry Pratt, Wayne Denn, Thomas A. Marotta, Jim Nowotny, Terrence J. McCulley, Garry Edward Hoffman, Thomas J. Lorey, David Bardascini, Christopher S. Zaleski, Stephen J. Aldstadt, Edward J. Stokes, Raymond Kosorek, John E. Prendergast, John W. Wallace, Jacob Palmateer, Tim Flaherty, Shooters Committee for Political Education, Fulton County NY Oath Keepers, Gun Owners of America, New York Revolution, NY2A.org, Doug Negley and Gun Rights Across America - New York
Defendant: Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta E. Lynch and Christopher M. Piehota
Case Number: 6:2015cv06765
Filed: December 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2018 Filing 22 MANDATE of USCA as to #21 Notice of Appeal: For the foregoing reasons, and finding no merit in Robinson's other arguments, we hereby AFFIRM the judgment of the district court. (JHF)
May 4, 2017 Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 of the US Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Forms C and D must be completed within 14 days after the filing of a notice of appeal. Forms C and D can be obtained at: <. (JHF)
May 3, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #19 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Stephen J. Aldstadt, David Bardascini, Michael Carpinelli, George Curbelo, Jr, Wayne Denn, Tim Flaherty, William R. Fox, Sr, Fulton County NY Oath Keepers, Gun Rights Across America - New York, Don Hey, Garry Edward Hoffman, Raymond Kosorek, Michael R. Kubow, Thomas J. Lorey, Thomas A. Marotta, Michael Mastrogiovanni, Kenneth E. Mathison, Terrence J. McCulley, NY2A.org, Doug Negley, New York Revolution, Jim Nowotny, Jacob Palmateer, John E. Prendergast, William Robinson, Harold W. Schroeder, Shooters Committee for Political Education, Edward J. Stokes, John W. Wallace, Leslie H. Wilson, Christopher S. Zaleski, Mattie D. Zarpentine. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0209-2776830. Appeal Record due by 5/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Capanna, Paloma)
April 11, 2017 Filing 20 JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/17. (JHF)
April 10, 2017 Filing 19 DECISION AND ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is dismissed, and Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/10/2017. (SC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 4, 2016 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Currently pending before the Court is the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), which was filed on 3/25/16. ECF No. 6. The Court entered a Scheduling Order that required any response from the Plaintiff to be filed by 4/15/16, and any reply from the Defendants to be filed 8 business days thereafter. ECF No. 7. On 4/16/16, the Plaintiff filed a Motion to extend the Court's scheduling order deadline of 4/15/16 to 4/16/16 (ECF No. 10), and for permission to file an oversized brief of 40 pages. That Motion is GRANTED. On 4/16/16, the Plaintiffs also filed a Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. ECF No. 9. That Cross Motion and its accompanying 42-page Memorandum of Law request, inter alia , that the Court "deny[ ] the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)." ECF No. 9, at 2. On 4/27/16, within the requisite 8 business days, the Defendants filed their reply papers with respect to their Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 14. Because it is jurisdictional, the Court must first consider the Defendants' argument under Rule 12(b)(1) that the Plaintiffs lack standing to bring this case. See Rhulen Agency, Inc. v. Ala. Ins. Guar. Ass'n, 896 F.2d 674, 678 (2d Cir. 1990) ("[T]he court should consider the Rule 12(b)(1) challenge first since if it must dismiss the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, the accompanying defenses and objections become moot and do not need to be determined."). Should the Court find that the Plaintiffs have standing, the Court will then consider the Defendants' argument under Rule 12(b)(6). Both the Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) motions are now fully briefed, and the Court will determine those motions in the ordinary course. Since the Motion to Dismiss is pending, the Court stays further briefing on the Plaintiff's Summary Judgment motion until after the Motion to Dismiss has been decided. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 5/4/16. (SCE)
April 27, 2016 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta E. Lynch, Christopher M. Piehota. (Swinton, Nathan)
April 27, 2016 Filing 13 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #9 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen J. Aldstadt, David Bardascini, Michael Carpinelli, George Curbelo, Jr, Wayne Denn, Tim Flaherty, William R. Fox, Sr, Fulton County NY Oath Keepers, Gun Rights Across America - New York, Don Hey, Garry Edward Hoffman, Raymond Kosorek, Michael R. Kubow, Thomas J. Lorey, Thomas A. Marotta, Michael Mastrogiovanni, Kenneth E. Mathison, Terrence J. McCulley, NY2A.org, Doug Negley, New York Revolution, Jim Nowotny, Jacob Palmateer, John E. Prendergast, William Robinson, Harold W. Schroeder, Shooters Committee for Political Education, Edward J. Stokes, John W. Wallace, Leslie H. Wilson, Christopher S. Zaleski, Mattie D. Zarpentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ATF Form 4473, #2 Exhibit GAO Letter 2016, #3 Exhibit GAO Letter Report 2009)(Capanna, Paloma)
April 27, 2016 Filing 12 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #9 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen J. Aldstadt, David Bardascini, Michael Carpinelli, George Curbelo, Jr, Wayne Denn, Tim Flaherty, William R. Fox, Sr, Fulton County NY Oath Keepers, Gun Rights Across America - New York, Don Hey, Garry Edward Hoffman, Raymond Kosorek, Michael R. Kubow, Thomas J. Lorey, Thomas A. Marotta, Michael Mastrogiovanni, Kenneth E. Mathison, Terrence J. McCulley, NY2A.org, Doug Negley, New York Revolution, Jim Nowotny, Jacob Palmateer, John E. Prendergast, William Robinson, Harold W. Schroeder, Shooters Committee for Political Education, Edward J. Stokes, John W. Wallace, Leslie H. Wilson, Christopher S. Zaleski, Mattie D. Zarpentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FBI Statement 2010, #2 Exhibit CRS Report 2005, #3 Exhibit GAO Report 2005, #4 Exhibit CRS Report 2004, #5 Exhibit GAO Report 2000)(Capanna, Paloma)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting request for withdrawal of plaintiffs Larry Pratt and Gun Owners of America from the proceedings. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/21/16. (JHF)
April 21, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stephen J. Aldstadt, David Bardascini, Michael Carpinelli, George Curbelo, Jr, Wayne Denn, Tim Flaherty, William R. Fox, Sr, Fulton County NY Oath Keepers, Gun Rights Across America - New York, Don Hey, Garry Edward Hoffman, Raymond Kosorek, Michael R. Kubow, Thomas J. Lorey, Thomas A. Marotta, Michael Mastrogiovanni, Kenneth E. Mathison, Terrence J. McCulley, NY2A.org, Doug Negley, New York Revolution, Jim Nowotny, Jacob Palmateer, John E. Prendergast, William Robinson, Harold W. Schroeder, Shooters Committee for Political Education, Edward J. Stokes, John W. Wallace, Leslie H. Wilson, Christopher S. Zaleski, Mattie D. Zarpentine.(Capanna, Paloma)
April 16, 2016 Filing 9 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stephen J. Aldstadt, David Bardascini, Michael Carpinelli, George Curbelo, Jr, Wayne Denn, Tim Flaherty, William R. Fox, Sr, Fulton County NY Oath Keepers, Gun Rights Across America - New York, Don Hey, Garry Edward Hoffman, Raymond Kosorek, Michael R. Kubow, Thomas J. Lorey, Thomas A. Marotta, Michael Mastrogiovanni, Kenneth E. Mathison, Terrence J. McCulley, NY2A.org, Doug Negley, New York Revolution, Jim Nowotny, Jacob Palmateer, John E. Prendergast, William Robinson, Harold W. Schroeder, Shooters Committee for Political Education, Edward J. Stokes, John W. Wallace, Leslie H. Wilson, Christopher S. Zaleski, Mattie D. Zarpentine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Memorandum in Support)(Capanna, Paloma)
March 31, 2016 E-Filing Notification re #8 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION: Document filed improperly as a motion. Court terminated motion and modified docket text to correctly reflect filing event. No action required. For future reference, use Notice (Other) event and relate it to existing motion. (LB)
March 31, 2016 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for Failure to State a Claim by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta E. Lynch, Christopher M. Piehota.(Swinton, Nathan) Modified on 3/31/2016 (LB).
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for Failure to State a Claim filed by Loretta E. Lynch, James B. Comey, Christopher M. Piehota, Thomas E. Brandon. Responses due by 4/15/2016. Replies may be filed eight (8) business days after the filing of responses. The Court will not hold oral argument but will decide the motion based on the papers submitted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/30/2016. (MC)
March 25, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for Failure to State a Claim by Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta E. Lynch, Christopher M. Piehota. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Swinton, Nathan)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Answer due date updated as to Thomas E. Brandon answer due 3/25/2016; James B. Comey answer due 3/25/2016; Loretta E. Lynch answer due 3/25/2016; Christopher M. Piehota answer due 3/25/2016. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/26/16. (JHF)
February 26, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Michael Swinton on behalf of All Defendants (Swinton, Nathan)
January 15, 2016 Summons Reissued as to Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta E. Lynch, Christopher M. Piehota. (JHF)
January 11, 2016 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against All Defendants, filed by Raymond Kosorek, Edward J. Stokes, Wayne Denn, William Robinson, Terrence J. McCulley, John W. Wallace, Larry Pratt, Jim Nowotny, Leslie H. Wilson, Kenneth E. Mathison, Thomas J. Lorey, Mattie D. Zarpentine, George Curbelo, Jr, Stephen J. Aldstadt, Don Hey, Michael R. Kubow, Harold W. Schroeder, Thomas A. Marotta, Michael Mastrogiovanni, William R. Fox, Sr, David Bardascini, Christopher S. Zaleski, John E. Prendergast, Garry Edward Hoffman, Michael Carpinelli.(Capanna, Paloma)
December 23, 2015 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at: <.(JHF)
December 23, 2015 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at: <. (JHF)
December 23, 2015 Summons Issued as to Thomas E. Brandon, James B. Comey, Loretta E. Lynch, Christopher M. Piehota. Mailed to plaintiffs' attorney. (JHF)
December 23, 2015 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS JS44. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lynch, Comey, Piehota, Brandon)(Capanna, Paloma)
December 23, 2015 E-Filing Notification re #1 COMPLAINT filed by Larry Pratt: Civil Cover Sheet not included. ACTION REQUIRED: File Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44) using Continuation of Exhibits event. Case assignment will proceed after document is filed. (LB)
December 22, 2015 Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. added. (JHF)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2429206.), filed by Larry Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Summons AO440)(Capanna, Paloma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Kubow
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Mathison
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold W. Schroeder
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Fox, Sr.
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Robinson
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carpinelli
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Curbelo, Jr.
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie H. Wilson
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mastrogiovanni
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Hey
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie D. Zarpentine
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Pratt
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Denn
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Marotta
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Nowotny
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence J. McCulley
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Edward Hoffman
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Lorey
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bardascini
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S. Zaleski
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Aldstadt
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Stokes
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Kosorek
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Prendergast
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Wallace
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Palmateer
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Flaherty
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shooters Committee for Political Education
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulton County NY Oath Keepers
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners of America
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Revolution
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NY2A.org
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Negley
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Rights Across America - New York
Represented By: Paloma A. Capanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Brandon
Represented By: Nathan Michael Swinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Comey
Represented By: Nathan Michael Swinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta E. Lynch
Represented By: Nathan Michael Swinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Piehota
Represented By: Nathan Michael Swinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?