Jordan v. Ellsworth et al
Plaintiff: Victoria L. Jordan
Defendant: Lisa Ellsworth and New York State Insurance Fund
Case Number: 6:2016cv06384
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Frank P. Geraci
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECISION AND ORDER: Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 46 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/17/2020. (MFM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated, Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default, ECF No. 24 , is GRANTED. The Court will refer this case to a magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings by separate order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/22/18. (JO)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 17 Motion to Amend or Correct. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/07/2017. (KAJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Ellsworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria L. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Insurance Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?