Parker v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Joe Parker
Defendant: United States, Joel D. Blackerby, Douglas Landy, Kim Dean and Clifton Springs Hospital
Case Number: 6:2016cv06475
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Seneca
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Wolford
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECISION AND ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing all remaining claims without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 03/26/2019. (CDH) (A copy of this Decision and Order was mailed to Plaintiff) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Parker's motions to appoint counsel 47 , 64 are denied without prejudice to renewal following the district court's decisions on the pending dispositive motions and his request to extend his time to respond to the pending motion for summary judgment 64 is granted. The Court's motion scheduling order 55 is modified as follows: plaintiff's response/opposition is due by December 6, 2018, and defendants' reply is due December 20, 2018. Defendant Blackerby' ;s motion to stay discovery 41 is granted in part and denied in part. Parker's motion to compel 51 is denied without prejudice to renewal. Specifically, if Parker wishes to challenge any interrogatory responses served by defendants, he mus t write to counsel by no later than November 21, 2018, to identify the response(s) he finds deficient and the reasons why, and confer with counsel about those deficiencies by no later than November 30, 2018. If that conferral does not resolve the di spute(s), Parker may file a motion to compel by no later than December 21, 2018. Finally, Parker's motion for a protective order 52 is denied. The parties are directed to submit to this Court a proposed confidentiality order by no later than November 30, 2018. In addition, the Clerk of the Court is directed to seal Exhibits 3, 4, 5, 6, 8, 15, 16 to [49-2] from public access. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 11/08/18. (CMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Main Document 68 replaced on 11/8/2018) (CAM).
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECISION AND ORDER screening 8 second amended complaint and denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court hereby dismisses Plaintiffs defamation and right to privacy claims without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e); denies Plaintiff s motion to appoint counsel (Dkt. 9) without prejudice; and directs the Clerk of Court to file Plaintiffs papers, and to cause the United States Marshals Service to serve copies of the summons, second amended complaint, and this Decision and Order u pon Defendants Blackerby, Landy, Dean, and Clifton Springs without Plaintiffs payment therefor, unpaid fees to be recoverable if this action terminates by monetary award in Plaintiffs favor. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/14/17. (JPL) (A copy of this Decision and Order has been mailed to Plaintiff)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Joe Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel D. Blackerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Landy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Springs Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?