Adams v. Annucci et al

Plaintiff: Michael Adams
Defendant: Imam Ififfy, C.O. Brinks, John Doe, Anthony J. Annucci, IGP Shelly Mallozzi, R.N. D. Allen, R.N. John Doe, Superintendent Picilo, K. Brooks, Cee Cee, A. Lowe and Counselor Tim S. Hourittan
Case Number: 6:2018cv06564
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Rochester Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2018 Per Pro se Office, copy of docket sheet mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
September 17, 2018 10 Letter from Michael Adams, dated 9/12/18, to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
September 4, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Adams. (JHF)
August 27, 2018 8 Letter from Michael Adams, dated 8/23/18, to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
August 21, 2018 Mailed copy of the #7 judgment to plaintiff. (TF)
August 21, 2018 7 JUDGMENT administratively terminating case. Signed by Clerk of Court on 8/21/18. (TF)
August 21, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action; the Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauper/s with supporting affirmation; if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this Order.. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 8/20/18. (mailed plaintiff a copy of this order and a form motion for IFP) (TF)
August 10, 2018 5 Letter from Michael Adams, dated 8/5/18, to US District Court (new case opening packet sent on 8/3/18) (TF)
August 3, 2018 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
August 3, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
August 3, 2018 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michael Adams. (JHF)
August 3, 2018 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Adams. (JHF)
August 3, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Adams. (JHF)
August 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-K, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Letter, #5 Envelope) (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imam Ififfy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Brinks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGP Shelly Mallozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Picilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cee Cee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor Tim S. Hourittan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?