Tuttle v. Zabawa

Plaintiff: Ronald Tuttle
Defendant: Francis Zabawa
Case Number: 6:2018cv06571
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Rochester Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 16 MOTION to Reopen Case by Ronald Tuttle.(TF)
September 22, 2018 15 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff now has until 12/31/18 to notify the Court in writing that he wishes to reopen the case by submitting (1) a properly supported in forma pauperis motion with the requisite inmate trust fund account certification (or institutional equivalent) and authorization form, or (2) the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee ($400.00 total). Plantiff's #13 Motion for a New Judge is denied without prejudice and may be refiled if the case is reopened. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/22/18. A copy of this Text Order has been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. (JO)
September 20, 2018 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee by Ronald Tuttle.(TF)
September 20, 2018 13 MOTION for New Judge by Ronald Tuttle. (JHF)
September 17, 2018 12 TEXT ORDER: On 9/14/18, Plaintiff filed a #11 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court grants the Motion and Plaintiff now has until 10/31/18 to notify the Court in writing that he wishes to reopen the case by submitting (1) a properly supported in forma pauperis motion with the requisite inmate trust fund account certification (or institutional equivalent) and authorization form, or (2) the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee ($400.00 total). Plantiff's remaining motions for various forms of relief--ECF Nos. #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 --are denied without prejudice and may be refiled if the case is reopened. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/17/18. A copy of this Text Order has been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. (JO)
September 14, 2018 11 MOTION for Extension of Time by Ronald Tuttle.(TF)
September 10, 2018 10 MOTION for placing exhibit K as an exhibit to #1 Complaint by Ronald Tuttle.(TF)
September 7, 2018 9 MOTION for due process challenge by Ronald Tuttle.(TF)
August 30, 2018 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ronald Tuttle.(TF)
August 30, 2018 7 MOTION to add exhibits to the #1 Complaint by Ronald Tuttle. (Attachments: #1 Motion)(TF)
August 30, 2018 Mailed a copy of the #6 Judgment to plaintiff. (TF)
August 30, 2018 6 JUDGMENT administratively terminating this action. Signed by Clerk of Court on 8/30/18. (TF)
August 30, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court will administratively terminate this action. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he must notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of this Order by submitting (1) a properly supported in forma pauperis motion with the requisite inmate trust fund account certification (or institutional equivalent) and authorization form, or (2) the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee ($400.00 total). Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/29/18. (mailed plaintiff a copy of this order and a form motion with supporting affirmation) (TF)
August 24, 2018 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Tuttle. (LB)
August 23, 2018 3 EXHIBITS by Ronald Tuttle to #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Tuttle. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(TF)
August 10, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Consent form, privacy notice and civil case timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF)
August 9, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Tuttle.(TF)
August 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Francis Zabawa, filed by Ronald Tuttle. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuttle v. Zabawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Zabawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?