Allstate Insurance Company as Subrogee of Vicki Smith-Drysdale v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company as Subrogee of Vicki Smith-Drysdale
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 6:2018cv06634
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Cerrone on behalf of The United States of America (Cerrone, Michael)
September 17, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company as Subrogee of Vicki Smith-Drysdale re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued as to USA, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Durkin, Thomas)
September 5, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company as Subrogee of Vicki Smith-Drysdale. (Durkin, Thomas)
September 4, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
September 4, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
September 4, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JHF)
September 4, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
September 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America ($400 receipt number 0209-3208604), filed by Allstate Insurance Company as Subrogee of Vicki Smith-Drysdale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to AAG, #3 Summons to AG, #4 Exhibit Form 95, #5 Exhibit Denial, #6 Exhibit Photographs)(Durkin, Thomas) Modified on 9/4/2018 (JHF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company as Subrogee of Vicki Smith-Drysdale v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company as Subrogee of Vicki Smith-Drysdale
Represented By: Thomas P. Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?