Air America Flight Center, LLC v. Eagle View Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Air America Flight Center, LLC
Defendant: Sandhills Aviation LLC, Steven W. Sherwood and Eagle View Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv06637
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 18 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/18/2018. (CDH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 17, 2018 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM directed to Specified Claims by Eagle View Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
October 17, 2018 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sandhills Aviation LLC, Steven W. Sherwood. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Paul L. Leclair)(Sher, Jeremy)
October 15, 2018 15 MOTION to appear pro hac vice (Austin Klar, Esq.) ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3247784.) by Eagle View Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Applicant Petition, #2 Affidavit by Sponsor, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles/Oath, #5 Attorney Database Input, #6 ECF Registration)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
October 15, 2018 14 MOTION to appear pro hac vice (Ashley Littlefield, Esq.) ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3247768.) by Eagle View Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Applicant Petition, #2 Affidavit by Sponsor, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles/Oath, #5 Attorney Database Input, #6 ECF Registration)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
October 15, 2018 13 MOTION to appear pro hac vice (Mark McKane, Esq.) ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3247742.) by Eagle View Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Applicant Petition, #2 Affidavit by Sponsor, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles/Oath, #5 Attorney Database Input, #6 ECF Registration)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/1/2018. Sandhills and Sherwood's time to answer or move to dismiss has been extended until October 17, 2018; opposition to motion by Air America is November 16, 2018; reply in further support by Sandhills and Sherwood shall be by November 30, 2018. (BK)
September 28, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Leclair on behalf of Sandhills Aviation LLC, Steven W. Sherwood (Leclair, Paul)
September 28, 2018 10 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/28/2018. (BK)
September 28, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony R. Sears on behalf of Eagle View Technologies, Inc. (Sears, Tony)
September 28, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eagle View Technologies, Inc.. (D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 28, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. D'Antonio on behalf of Eagle View Technologies, Inc. (D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
September 20, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Steven W. Sherwood on September 11, 2018, filed by Air America Flight Center, LLC. (Huttenlocher, Michael)
September 20, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Eagle View Technologies, Inc. on September 7. 2018, filed by Air America Flight Center, LLC. (Huttenlocher, Michael)
September 20, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sandhills Aviation, LLC on September 7, 2018, filed by Air America Flight Center, LLC. (Huttenlocher, Michael)
September 5, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (BK)
September 5, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK)
September 5, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
September 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK)
September 4, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air America Flight Center, LLC. (Huttenlocher, Michael)
September 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Eagle View Technologies, Inc., Sandhills Aviation LLC, Steven W. Sherwood $ 400 receipt number 0209-3209227, filed by Air America Flight Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons to Eagle View Technologies, LLC, #10 Summons to Sandhills Aviation LLC, #11 Summons to Steven W. Sherwood)(Huttenlocher, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Air America Flight Center, LLC v. Eagle View Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandhills Aviation LLC
Represented By: Jeremy M. Sher
Represented By: Paul L. Leclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven W. Sherwood
Represented By: Jeremy M. Sher
Represented By: Paul L. Leclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle View Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas S. D'Antonio
Represented By: Mark McKane
Represented By: Ashley Littlefield
Represented By: Austin Klar
Represented By: Tony R. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air America Flight Center, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Huttenlocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?