Alcorn v. Gatehouse Media, LLC

Plaintiff: Victor Alcorn
Defendant: Gatehouse Media, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv06722
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendant now has until December 28, 2018, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/6/18. A copy of this order has been e-mailed to defense counsel. (JO)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by Gatehouse Media, LLC. (Neidl, Cynthia)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gatehouse Media, LLC. (TF)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing a copyright Case sent to USCO. (TF) (TF).
October 9, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
October 9, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
October 9, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gatehouse Media, LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3241197, filed by Victor Alcorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcorn v. Gatehouse Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Alcorn
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatehouse Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?