Howard v. Hodgins

Appellant: Eric Howard
Appellee: Mia Hodgins
Case Number: 6:2018cv06779
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to perfect appeal by Eric Howard.(TF)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/11/2018, before Judge Paul R. Warren. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane S. Martens, Telephone number 585-613-4311. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2019. (BK)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/27/2018, before Judge Paul R. Warren. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane S. Martens, Telephone number 585-613-4311. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2019. (BK)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Designated Items - Notice of Motion to Avoid Judicial Liens. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Hearing, #2 Order denying Motion) (BK)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal. (BK)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Designation of Items. (BK)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Statement of Issues to be Presented. (BK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Eric Howard re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (BK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 2:18-20089. File received, filed by Eric Howard. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal, #2 Order being appealed) (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Hodgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Eric Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mia Hodgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?