United States of America v. The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements at 137 Tennyson Way, Mendon, New York

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements at 137 Tennyson Way, Mendon, New York (That is, All That Tract or Parcel of Land, Situate in the Town of Mendon, County o and The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements at 137 Tennyson Way, Mendon, New York
Claimant: Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company, Patrick Gallo and The Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company
Case Number: 6:2018cv06790
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Referring Judge: Marian W Payson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2019 10:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/13/2018. (KAH)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 12/12/18. (PR)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 CLAIM Verified Claim by The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements at 137 Tennyson Way, Mendon, New York. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DeCarolis, Brian)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date December 5, 2018. (Carducci, Grace)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company re #5 Claim (Palmer, Devin)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 CLAIM (Verified Claim) by Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Note, #4 Exhibit D - Statement)(Palmer, Devin)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Carducci, Grace)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace M. Carducci on behalf of United States of America (Carducci, Grace)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property Issued. (LMD)
November 5, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD)
November 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Hon. David G. Larimer. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (LMD)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements at 137 Tennyson Way, Mendon, New York (That is, All That Tract or Parcel of Land, Situate in the Town of Mendon, County o, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property)(Smith, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements at 137 Tennyson Way, Mendon, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements at 137 Tennyson Way, Mendon, New York (That is, All That Tract or Parcel of Land, Situate in the Town of Mendon, County o
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements at 137 Tennyson Way, Mendon, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kathryn L. Smith
Represented By: Grace M. Carducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patrick Gallo
Represented By: Brian Christopher DeCarolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: The Canandaigua National Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Devin Lawton Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?