McGrew v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Freddy McGrew
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 6:2018cv06799
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 JUDGMENT signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 12/6/2018. A copy of this Judgment, #3 Order and a form motion with supporting affirmation has been mailed to the Plaintiff at Attica Correctional. (BK)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 12/4/2018. This action is administratively terminated; if Plaintiff wishes to reopen the action, he must so notify the Court in writing no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiffs writing shall include either a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a completed and signed Prison Certification and a Prison Authorization form or pay the $400.00 filing fee. (BK)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Freddy McGrew. (BK)
November 7, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. The Pro Se Packet including: the Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and the Civil Case Timeline have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (BK)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Freddy McGrew. (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGrew v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?