Morse et al v. Stamps et al

Plaintiff: Mahina Napier, Lisa Morse and Nebka Napier
Defendant: Ronzell Stamps, Patrick Antonio Napier, Ronzell Stamp's relatives, Street gang - associates, Doris Roman and Lisa Morse's relatives whom associate with defendants, Bobby Kirven's relatives and Mr. Bobby Kirven
Case Number: 6:2018cv06865
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/INDEX filed and electronically sent to Court of Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Index) (JHF)
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT by Lisa Morse. (JHF)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Lisa Morse. Fee not paid. Any appeal would not be taken in good faith and leave to appeal as a poor person denied. Requests to proceed on appeal as a poor person must be filed with the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. (JHF)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. 1915 and 1915A. Signed by Clerk on 1/15/19. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiffs. (JHF)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 DECISION AND ORDER dismissing complaint. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. 1915 and 1915A; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk enter judgment for Defendants and close this case. The Court also hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this judgment would not be taken in good faith and therefore denies leave to appeal as a poor person. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 82 S.Ct. 917, 8 L.Ed.2d 21 (1962). Petitioner must file any notice of appeal with the Clerk's Office, United States District Court, Western District of New York, within thirty (30) days of the date of judgment in this action. Requests to proceed on appeal as a poor person must be filed with the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in accordance with the requirements of Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/14/19. Copy of this NEF and decision and order mailed to pro se plaintiff at P.O. Box 92034, Rochester, NY 14692. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIRMATION of Service filed by Lisa Morse. (JHF)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF by Lisa Morse. (JHF)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF by Lisa Morse. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 DECISION AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #5 Motion for miscellaneous relief. The Court will permit Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint. Such an amended complaint would completely replace the pending original complaint in this action and must comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8. Factual allegations must allege a plausible Federal cause of action, or show how the Court has diversity jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall have until January 4, 2019, to file an amended complaint.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 12/20/18. Copy of this NEF and order mailed to pro se plaintiffs at P.O. Box 92034,Rochester, NY 14692 (KAP)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief by Lisa Morse. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief by Lisa Morse. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief by Lisa Morse. (JHF)
December 3, 2018 Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program, Civil Case Timeline and ADR Notification given to plaintiff at Clerk's Office front counter. (JHF)
December 3, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
December 3, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mahina Napier. (JHF)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nebka Napier. (JHF)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisa Morse. (JHF)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa Morse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse et al v. Stamps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronzell Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Antonio Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronzell Stamp's relatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Street gang - associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Roman and Lisa Morse's relatives whom associate with defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Kirven's relatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Bobby Kirven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahina Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebka Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?