Stell v. Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Stell
Defendant: Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC and Forster & Garbus, LLP.
Case Number: 6:2018cv06895
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (MD)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for defendants to answer is extended to February 7, 2019. Motions terminated: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Returned Executed filed by Forster & Garbus, LLP... Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 12/28/18. (JMC)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC.(Fjermedal, Glenn)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Returned Executed by Forster & Garbus, LLP..(Fjermedal, Glenn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Stell. Forster & Garbus, LLP. served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Andrews, Seth)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Stell. Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Andrews, Seth)
December 7, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
December 7, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC, Forster & Garbus, LLP. (JHF)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3299279, filed by Kevin Stell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Andrews, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stell v. Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Stell
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Represented By: Seth Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC
Represented By: Glenn M. Fjermedal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forster & Garbus, LLP.
Represented By: Glenn M. Fjermedal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?