Lopez Canas v. Whitaker, et al
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen and Thomas E. Feeley
Petitioner: Jose H Lopez Canas
Respondent: Jeffery Searls, Matthew G Whitaker, Attorney General of the United States and Matthew G. Whitaker
Case Number: 6:2019cv06031
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Barrie Moar on behalf of Thomas E. Feeley, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jeffery Searls, Matthew G. Whitaker (Moar, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this order respondent shall file and serve an answer with memo of law to the petition, petitioner will have 25 days after he receives respondent's answer to file a written response to the answer or motion. The clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the petition together with a copy of this order via notice of electronic filing to to the US Attorney's Office, WDNY at USANYW-Immigration-Habeas@usdoj.gov. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/16/19. (Attachments: #1 petition)(TF)
January 10, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Modified docket to correct party names and add party text re #1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Parties should be added as they appear on the petition. No action required.(TF)
January 10, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
January 10, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-3328590.), filed by Jose H Lopez Canas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix)(Graziano, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Canas v. Whitaker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose H Lopez Canas
Represented By: Robert F. Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Feeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffery Searls
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G Whitaker, Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?