Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC v. Xerox Corp.

Plaintiff: Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC
Defendant: Xerox Corp.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06036
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 76 Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:17-cv-00478.
January 7, 2019 Case transferred to District of USDC - Western District of New York. Original electronic file sent. (LKO) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
January 7, 2019 75 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Patent. Memorandum and Order Transferring case to the USDC - Western District of New York filed on 12/6/18. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum and Order) (LKO) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC's Statement of Objections (Filing No. #71 in 8:17CV478) to the magistrate judge's findings and recommendation is overruled. The magistrate judge's findings and recommendation (Filing No. #70 in 8:17CV478) is accepted. Defendant Xerox Corp.'s Motion to Transfer (Filing No. #57 in 8:17CV478) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall transfer Case No. 8:17CV478 to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (LKO) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
November 8, 2018 73 BRIEF in opposition to OBJECTION to Findings and Recommendation, #70 MASA's Objections to Magistrate Judge Findings and Recommendations #72 by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Counter Claimant Xerox Corp., Defendant Xerox Corp..(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
October 25, 2018 72 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION to Findings and Recommendation, #70 MASA's Objections to Magistrate Judge Findings and Recommendations by Attorney Cristina L. Martinez on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC, Counter Defendant Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC.(Martinez, Cristina) Modified on 11/15/2018 to change document type to BRIEF (JSF). [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
October 25, 2018 71 OBJECTION regarding: FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Xerox Corporation's Motion to Transfer #57 #70 MASA's Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge Findings and Recommendations by Attorney Cristina L. Martinez on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC, Counter Defendant Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC.(Martinez, Cristina) Modified on 11/15/2018 to change document type to Objection (JSF). [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 70 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to United States District Court Judge Robert Rossiter, Jr. that Defendant's Motion to Transfer (Filing No. #57 ) be granted and that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
October 4, 2018 69 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Attorney Cristina L. Martinez on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC, Counter Defendant Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Martinez, Cristina) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
September 28, 2018 68 NOTICE of Defendant Xerox Corporation's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
July 9, 2018 67 REPLY to Counterclaim by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC (Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
June 18, 2018 66 Defendant Xerox Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 First Amended Complaint and Defendant's, COUNTERCLAIM against Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 filed by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC by Xerox Corp. (Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 23, 2018 65 REPLY regarding MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Xerox Corporation's Motion to Transfer #57 Defendant Xerox Corporation's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp..(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 16, 2018 64 INDEX in support of Brief, #63 MASA's Index of Evidence in Support of MASA's Brief in Opposition to Xerox's Motion to Transfer Venue by Attorney Cristina L. Martinez on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Martinez Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 - Thomas Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Martinez, Cristina) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 16, 2018 63 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Xerox Corporation's Motion to Transfer #57 MASA's Brief in Opposition to Xerox's Motion to Transfer Venue by Attorney Cristina L. Martinez on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC.(Martinez, Cristina) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 7, 2018 62 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #61 for attorney Cristina L. Martinez. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 7, 2018 61 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Cristina L. Martinez Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3677688 by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC.(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 4, 2018 60 TEXT ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. A telephone conference was held on May 4, 2018. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by June 18, 2018. (LRH) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 2, 2018 59 INDEX in support of MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Xerox Corporation's Motion to Transfer #57 , Brief, #58 Defendant Xerox Corporation's Index of Evidence in Support of its Motion to Transfer and Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Transfer by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4, #6 Exhibit A5, #7 Exhibit A6, #8 Exhibit A7, #9 Exhibit A8, #10 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 2, 2018 58 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Xerox Corporation's Motion to Transfer #57 Defendant Xerox Corporation's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Transfer by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp..(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 2, 2018 57 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Xerox Corporation's Motion to Transfer by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp..(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 56 TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal #51 , William B. Wray is terminated as counsel of record in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 55 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 54 TEXT ORDER - A scheduling dispute has arisen in this case. A telephone conference will be held May 4, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. to discuss the matter. A separate order with case conference instructions will be filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 30, 2018 53 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Entry of Appearance by Attorney Carol A. Svolos on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp. (Svolos, Carol) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 27, 2018 52 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to William Wray at bruce.wray@kutakrock.com regarding Notice (Other) #51 . Mail not resent no forwarding address, Mr. Wray no longer with Kutak Rock. (LKO) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 27, 2018 51 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp. (Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 50 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 10) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66 (part 12)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #2 Exhibit 66 (part 13)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #3 Exhibit 67--Brenva Brochure, #4 Exhibit 68--Photograph, #5 Exhibit 69--Photograph, #6 Exhibit 70--Screenshot of Illustration, #7 Exhibit 71--FreeFlow Express to Print, #8 Exhibit 72--Customer Release Notes, #9 Exhibit 73--Phaser 7800 Brochure)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 49 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 9) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66 (part 9)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #2 Exhibit 66 (part 10)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #3 Exhibit 66 (part 11)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 48 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 8) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66 (part 6)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #2 Exhibit 66 (part 7)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #3 Exhibit 66 (part 8)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 47 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 7) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66 (part 3)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #2 Exhibit 66 (part 4)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #3 Exhibit 66 (part 5)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 46 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 6) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62 (part 2)--Color Qube All Guides, #2 Exhibit 63--iGen 5 Press Brochure, #3 Exhibit 64--iGen 5 Press Brochure, #4 Exhibit 65--Screenshot of Inner Design, #5 Exhibit 66 (part 1)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual, #6 Exhibit 66 (part 2)--Phaser 7800 Service Manual)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 45 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 5) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54 (part 2)--Color 800/1000 Press User Guide, #2 Exhibit 55--Design and File Preparation Guidelines, #3 Exhibit 56--Finishing Solutions, #4 Exhibit 57--iGen 5 Brochure, #5 Exhibit 58--iGen 5 Specialty Effects Brochure, #6 Exhibit 59--ColorQube Web Pages, #7 Exhibit 60--ColorQube Service Manual, #8 Exhibit 61--ColorQube Quick Use Guide, #9 Exhibit 62 (part 1)--Color Qube All Guides)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 44 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 4) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 53 (part 2)--Phaser 7700 Service Manual, #2 Exhibit 53 (part 3)--Phaser 7700 Service Manual, #3 Exhibit 54 (part 1)--Color 800/1000 Press User Guide)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 43 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 3) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 49 (part 2)--Phaser WorkCentre Service Manual, #2 Exhibit 49 (part 3)--Phaser WorkCentre Service Manual, #3 Exhibit 50--Screenshot of Menu, #4 Exhibit 51--Screenshot of Menu, #5 Exhibit 52--Screenshot of Menu, #6 Exhibit 53 (part 1)--Phaser 7700 Service Manual)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 42 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 2) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47--Phaser User Guide, #2 Exhibit 48--Parts List, #3 Exhibit 49--Phaser WorkCentre Service Manual)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 41 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 1) regarding Amended Complaint,,,,, #40 . by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31 (part 2)--Phaser Family Service Documentation, #2 Exhibit 31 (part 3)--Phaser Family Service Documentation, #3 Exhibit 32--Screenshot of New Job Menu, #4 Exhibit 33--Screenshot of Job Setup Tab, #5 Exhibit 34--FreeFlow Express to Print, #6 Exhibit 35--Screenshot ofText Annotation Properties Menu, #7 Exhibit 36--Screenshot of Select Printer Menu, #8 Exhibit 37--One-Click Booklet Production, #9 Exhibit 38--Screenshot of Free Flow Menu, #10 Exhibit 39--Screenshot of Menu, #11 Exhibit 40--FreeFlow Customer Expectations Document, #12 Exhibit 41--Screenshot of Submit Job Menu, #13 Exhibit 42--FreeFlow Makeready, #14 Exhibit 43--Screenshot of Menu, #15 Exhibit 44--FreeFlow Print Server for Versant 3100 Press, #16 Exhibit 45 (part 1)--FreeFlow Output Manager User Guide, #17 Exhibit 45 (part 2)--FreeFlow Output Manager User Guide, #18 46--FreeFlow Print Server for Global Print Driver)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
April 20, 2018 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Xerox Corp., by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--'005 B1 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2--'684 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3--'314 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4--'756 Patent, #5 Exhibit 5--'974 Patent, #6 Exhibit 6--'285 Patent, #7 Exhibit 7--'998 Patent, #8 Exhibit 8--'005 B2 Patent, #9 Exhibit 9--'856 Patent, #10 Exhibit 10--'278 Patent, #11 Exhibit 11--'582 Patent, #12 Exhibit 12--'375 Patent, #13 Exhibit 13-'425 Patent, #14 Exhibit 14--'415 Patent, #15 Exhibit 15--'255 Patent, #16 Exhibit 16--'795 Patent, #17 Exhibit 17--'089 Patent, #18 Exhibit 18--'022 Patent, #19 Exhibit 19--'113 Patent, #20 Exhibit 20--'239 Patent, #21 Exhibit 21--WorkCentre web pages, #22 Exhibit 22--VersaLink web pages, #23 Exhibit 23--Phaser 7500 web pages, #24 Exhibit 24--iGen web pages, #25 Exhibit 25--Brenva web pages, #26 Exhibit 26--ColorQube web pages, #27 Exhibit 27--800i & 100i web pages, #28 Exhibit 28--FreeFlow Print Server web pages, #29 Exhibit 29--WorkCenter User Guide, #30 Exhibit 30--Work Center Family Service Documentation, #31 Exhibit 31 (part 1)--Phaser Family Service Documentation)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Xerox Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. #31 ) the Complaint is granted. Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC shall have until April 20, 2018, to file an amended complaint setting forth sufficient infringement allegations. If Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC fails to file a timely amended complaint, this case will be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
March 13, 2018 38 REPLY regarding Brief, #34 Defendant Xerox Corporation's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp..(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
March 12, 2018 37 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney David Nelson for Defendant Xerox Corp. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8046538. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
March 12, 2018 36 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Eric Huang for Defendant Xerox Corp. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8046537. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
March 12, 2018 35 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Steven Cherny for Defendant Xerox Corp. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8046536. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
March 6, 2018 34 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #31 by Attorney Mark A. Baghdassarian on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Evidence in Support of Opposition Briefs, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Baghdassarian, Mark) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
February 15, 2018 33 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #31 , Brief #32 Index of Evidence in Support of Defendant Xerox Corporations' Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
February 15, 2018 32 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #31 by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp..(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
February 15, 2018 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp..(Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 30 TEXT ORDER granting #26 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Jeana Goosmann, Joel Carney and William Hale are hereby terminated as counsel of record for Defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
February 9, 2018 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William B. Wray on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp. (Wray, William) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
February 9, 2018 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp. (Passarelli, John) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
February 9, 2018 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jason S. Jackson on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp. (Jackson, Jason) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
February 9, 2018 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp..(Hale, William) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 15, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
January 25, 2018 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp..(Hale, William) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
January 12, 2018 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Xerox Corp. on 12/14/2017. (Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
January 9, 2018 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corp. (Hale, William) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
January 2, 2018 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Joel M. Carney on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corporation.(Carney, Joel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 22, 2017 20 NOTICE of Appearance of James Hannah by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC (Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 21, 2017 19 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Xerox Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JSF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Xerox Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 5, 2018.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 20, 2017 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Joel M. Carney on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corporation.(Carney, Joel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 20, 2017 16 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Application/Order Pro Hac Vice #14 is stricken for the following reason(s): the document is a duplicate of document number #9 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to attorney without CM/ECF registration) (KLF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 20, 2017 15 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Application/Order Pro Hac Vice #11 is stricken for the following reason(s): the document is a duplicate of document number #10 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to attorneys without CM/ECF registration) (KLF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 19, 2017 14 *STRICKEN* APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Paul Andre for Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8045468. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF) Modified on 12/20/2017 to strike per Text Strike Order 16 (KLF). [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 19, 2017 13 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney James Hannah for Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8045468. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 19, 2017 12 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Lisa Kobialka for Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8045468. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 19, 2017 11 *STRICKEN* APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Mark A. Baghdassarian for Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8045468. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF) Modified on 12/20/2017 to strike per Text Strike Order 15 (KLF). [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 19, 2017 10 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Mark A. Baghdassarian for Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8045468. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 19, 2017 9 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Paul Andre for Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8045468. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 19, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Joel M. Carney on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corporation (Carney, Joel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 19, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jeana L. Goosmann on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corporation (Goosmann, Jeana) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 14, 2017 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent. Complaint filed on 12/13/2017. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JAB) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 14, 2017 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Xerox Corporation regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KMM) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 13, 2017 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (JAB) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 13, 2017 3 Summons Requested as to Xerox Corporation regarding Complaint,,,, #1 . (Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 13, 2017 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Midwest Youth A&S, Inc. for Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiffs Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC, Midwest Youth A&S, Inc..(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]
December 13, 2017 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand For Patent Infringement against Xerox Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3580909), by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - '005 B1 Patent, #2 Exhibit #2 - '684 Patent, #3 Exhibit #3 - '314 Patent, #4 Exhibit #4 - '756 Patent, #5 Exhibit #5 - '974 Patent, #6 Exhibit #6 - '285 Patent, #7 Exhibit #7 - '998 Patent, #8 Exhibit #8 - '005 B2 Patent, #9 Exhibit #9 - '856 Patent, #10 Exhibit #10 - '278 Patent, #11 Exhibit #11 - '582 Patent, #12 Exhibit #12 - '375 Patent, #13 Exhibit #13 - '425 Patent, #14 Exhibit #14 - '415 Patent, #15 Exhibit #15 - '255 Patent, #16 Exhibit #16 - '795 Patent, #17 Exhibit #17 - '089 Patent, #18 Exhibit #18 - '022 Patent, #19 Exhibit #19 - '113 Patent, #20 Exhibit #20 - '239 Patent)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC v. Xerox Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corp.
Represented By: David Nelson
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: William J. Hale
Represented By: Carol A. Svolos
Represented By: Steven Cherny
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Eric Huang
Represented By: Jason S. Jackson
Represented By: William B. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC
Represented By: Cristina L. Martinez
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Represented By: James Hannah
Represented By: Mark A. Baghdassarian
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?