Jones v. West et al

Plaintiff: Lester Q Jones
Defendant: James Colvin, Z. Meeks, Ostrander, West, Lindsey Pryor and Bognaski
Case Number: 6:2019cv06037
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. A copy of this form has been mailed to the Plaintiff at Elmira Correctional. (BK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:18-cv-01369.
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines: Notice of Compliance Deadline 2/7/2019; Case Review Deadline 3/7/2019. (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Elmira Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #3 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application (Dkt. No. #5 ) is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Clerk file a copy of the "affidavits" (Dkt. No. 1-1) immediately following the signature page of the complaint. ORDERED that the claims against defendants Meeks, West, Bognaski, and Colvin are severed and transferred to the Western District of New York. ORDERED that the Clerk shall advise the Clerk of the Western District of New York, in writing, of the entry of this Order and provide that Clerk with a certified copy of this Order and of the docket sheet for this action, together with all information necessary for the Western District Clerk to electronically access the documents filed in this action. ORDERED that the Clerk shall remove Meeks, West, Bognaski, and Colvin from the docket as defendants in the Northern District action. ORDERED that plaintiff's claims for damages against defendants Pryor and Ostrander are conditionally DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). ORDERED that, if plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must file an amended complaint as directed above within thirty (30) days from the filing date of this Decision and Order. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/7/2019. (Decision and Order mailed to plaintiff via regular mail). (rar) [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket.Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 12/10/2018. (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lester Q Jones. (Attachments: #1 cover letter) (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/27/18. {order and blank ifp form served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Lester Q Jones. (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lester Q Jones. (rar, ) [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bognaski, James Colvin, Z. Meeks, Ostrander, Lindsey Pryor, West filed by Lester Q Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope)(rar, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/7/2019) (rar, ). [Transferred from nynd on 1/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Q Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ostrander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bognaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?