Wass v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Sally Ann Wass
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2019cv06038
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Kershner on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Kershner, Joshua)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (BK)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that Plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore her motion (Docket # 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiffs papers without payment of fees. Plaintiffs attorney shall perform the service of papers in this matter, which may be done by certified mail. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/15/19. (NNR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 14, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
January 14, 2019 Case placed in Social Security pool. (BK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sally Ann Wass.(Hiller, Kenneth)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sally Ann Wass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hiller, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wass v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joshua L. Kershner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Ann Wass
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?