Chaney v. Towner Tree Farms, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexess Chaney
Defendant: Towner Tree Farms, LLC, Barbara A. Towner, Terry L. Towner and Towner Living Trust
Case Number: 6:2019cv06054
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barbara A. Towner, Terry L. Towner, Towner Living Trust, Towner Tree Farms, LLC. (Bond, Keith)
March 13, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 10:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/8/2019. (KAH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 2/22/19. (KJA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Barbara A. Towner, Terry L. Towner, Towner Living Trust, Towner Tree Farms, LLC. (Bond, Keith)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Barbara A. Towner, Terry L. Towner, Towner Living Trust, Towner Tree Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Answer to Complaint)(Bond, Keith)
January 17, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
January 17, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Barbara A. Towner, Terry L. Towner, Towner Living Trust, Towner Tree Farms, LLC. (JHF)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to chambers of online civil case opening. (JHF)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Towner Tree Farms, LLC, Towner Living Trust, Terry L. Towner, Barbara A. Towner ($400 receipt number 0209-3337548), filed by Alexess Chaney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Skivington, Peter) Modified on 1/17/2019 (JHF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaney v. Towner Tree Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towner Tree Farms, LLC
Represented By: Keith N. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara A. Towner
Represented By: Keith N. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Towner
Represented By: Keith N. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towner Living Trust
Represented By: Keith N. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexess Chaney
Represented By: Peter K. Skivington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?