Morse v. Accordino et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Morse
Defendant: Daniel Accordino, Burger King and Burger King Management, Mt. Hope Ave.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06142
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 CLERKS CERTIFICATE/Index filed and electronically sent to Court of Appeals (TF)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Lisa Morse re #13 Notice of Appeal (TF)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #6 Judgment by Lisa Morse. (Fee status: IFP granted) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TF)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 DECISION ORDER denying #10 Motion.. This action has been dismissed. Nevertheless, on March 7, 2019, Lisa Morse, proceeding pro se, filed motion captioned as Motion for Honorable Frank Geraci to Reinstate Claims Due to Mary Loewenguth and Staff Bias Toward Plaintiff Claimant Due to In Propia Persona Status. This is just the latest in a long series of frivolous filings by Ms. Morse during the past few months.The application [#10] lacks any arguable basis in fact or law, and is denied. The Court hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). Further requests to proceed on appeal as a poor person should be directed, on motion, to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, in accordance with Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/11/19. Copy of this decision and order and NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff at P.O. Box 92034, Rochester, NY 14692 (KAP) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/12/2019) (KAP).
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa Morse re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appeal (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TF)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed without prejudice due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Clerk of Court on 3/8/19. (mailed a copy of this judgment to plaintiff Lisa Morse)(TF)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Lisa Morse.(TF)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 DECISION AND ORDER re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. ORDERED, that the prior Decision and Order [#5] is amended to indicate that the action is dismissed without prejudice due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and it is furtherORDERED, that to the extent Plaintiff intended the proposed pleading [#7] to constitute a motion for reconsideration it is denied; Plaintiffs self-diagnosis of an arm/shoulder fracture is not plausible on its face, even without regard to Plaintiffs well-documented pattern of filing fantastical claims, and does not change the Courts view as to the lack of subject-matter jurisdiction in any event.The Court hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). Further requests to proceed on appeal as a poor person should be directed, on motion, to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, in accordance with Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/4/19. Copy of this NEF and decision and order mailed to pro se plaintiff at P.O. Box 92034, Rochester, NY 14692 (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MODIFIED/AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa Morse.(TF)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing action with prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court on 2/28/19. Mailed a copy of this judgment to plaintiff Morse)(TF)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffs motion [#2] for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted and this action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this action. The Court hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). Further requests to proceed on appeal as a poor person should be directed, on motion, to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, in accordance with Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 2/27/19. Copy of this NEF and order mailed to pro se plaintiff at P.O. Box 92034, Rochester, NY 14692 (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Lisa Morse, dated 2/22/19, to Clerk of Court (TF)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Lisa Morse, dated 2/22/19, to Clerk, Judge Geraci, Geoff Cox..... (TF)
February 26, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
February 26, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Pro se packet and ADR info handed to plaintiff on this day. (TF)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisa Morse.(TF)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Accordino, Burger King, Burger King Management, Mt. Hope Ave., filed by Lisa Morse.(TF) Modified date filed on 2/26/2019 (TF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse v. Accordino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Accordino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King Management, Mt. Hope Ave.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?