Fadeko v. Barr et al

Petitioner: Olakunle Murufe Fadeko
Respondent: Jeffrey Searls, William Barr and Thomas Feeley
Case Number: 6:2019cv06372
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jeffrey Searls re #4 Response to Habeas Petition, #5 Memorandum in Opposition (Khalil, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jeffrey Searls. (Khalil, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Barr, Olakunle Murufe Fadeko, Thomas Feeley, Jeffrey Searls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of DO Marchewka, #2 Exhibit A to DO Marchewka Declaration, #3 Declaration of DO Hobart)(Khalil, Adam)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Khalil on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jeffrey Searls (Khalil, Adam)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this Order, Respondents shall file and serve an answer and memo of law responding to the allegations in the Petition.Petitioner shall have 25 days after his receipt of Respondents' answer or motion to dismiss to file a written response. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, electronically via a Notice of Electronic Filing to the United States Attorney's Office, Western District of New York. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 5/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(mailed a copy of this order to petitioner)(TF)
May 20, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Pro se packet including consent form, privacy notice and timeline mailed to petitioner. (TF)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Olakunle Murufe Fadeko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5-9, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope) Filing Fee paid, receipt #ROC011434 $5.00(TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fadeko v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Searls
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Feeley
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Olakunle Murufe Fadeko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?