Ellis v. University of Rochester
Plaintiff: Francis Ellis
Defendant: University of Rochester
Case Number: 6:2019cv06380
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's IFP application [#4] is denied. Plaintiff's alternate demand for appointment of pro bono counsel is also denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this action unless, on or before August 15, 2019, Plaintiff pays the filing fee. In the event that the action is closed due to Plaintiffs failure to pay the filing fee, the Court hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). Further requests to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis should be directed on motion to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in accordance with Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/15/19. Copy of this decision and order and NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff at 203 Market StreetMarcus Hook, PA 19061 (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francis Ellis. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 Supplement to Motion, #3 envelope)(TF)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 DECISION AND ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's application [#64] for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Within thirty days of the date of this Decision and Order (by July 31, 2019) Plaintiff may submit a new application to proceed in forma pauperis, which must explain how he is currently being supported. If Plaintiff is being supported by another person, such as a parent, spouse, friend or significant other, he must provide that person's financial information. If Plaintiff fails to file a new application within thirty days as ordered, the Court will dismiss this action unless he instead pays the filing fee by that same date. To the extent that Plaintiff is demanding preliminary injunctive relief, the application is denied. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/1/19. Copy of this decision and order and NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff at 203 Market Street, Marcus Hook, PA 19061 (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 24, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
May 24, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Consent form, privacy notice, Pro Se Assistance Program Info, Timeline and ADR Notification mailed to the plaintiff. (TF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francis Ellis.(TF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND INJUNCTION against University of Rochester, filed by Francis Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. University of Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?