Omaliki v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Adrian Omaliki
Respondent: William Barr, Thomas Feeley and Jeffery Searls
Case Number: 6:2019cv06397
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Order,, Responses due by 8/29/2019.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/26/19. Copy of this NEF mailed to pro se petitioner at Buffalo. (KAP)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Order,, by William Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jeffery Searls.(Moar, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/14/2019. Within 45 days of the date of this order, Respondents shall file and serve an answer to the application and may file a motion to dismiss the application accompanied by pertinent exhibits. Petitioner shall have 25 days upon receipt of the Answer to file a written response. A copy of the application and this order has been served electronically to the United States Attorney's Office, Western District of New York at USANYW-IMMIGRATION-Habeas@usdoj.gov. Petitioner must forward a copy of all future papers and correspondence to the attorney appearing for the Respondent. A copy of this order has been mailed to the Petitioner at Buffalo Federal Detention Facility. (BK)
May 29, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number BUF064534. (BK)
May 29, 2019 The Pro Se Packet including: the Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and the Civil Case Timeline have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (BK)
May 29, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Adrian Omaliki. (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omaliki v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Feeley
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffery Searls
Represented By: Daniel Barrie Moar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian Omaliki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?