Kader v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Shah MD Imran Kader
Respondent: Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls and William P. Barr
Case Number: 6:2019cv06401
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls re #4 Response to Habeas Petition, #5 Memorandum in Opposition (Khalil, Adam)
July 25, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect.pdf file attached to entry. Action required: re-file entry with correct attachment and new proof of service RE #6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (TF)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls re #4 Response to Habeas Petition, #5 Memorandum in Opposition (Khalil, Adam)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls. (Khalil, Adam)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Answer and Return RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of DO Oliveri, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of DO Oliveri, #3 Declaration Declaration of DO Hobart)(Khalil, Adam)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Khalil on behalf of William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Jefferey Searls (Khalil, Adam)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this Order, Respondents shall file and serve an answer responding to the allegations in the Petition. Petitioner shall have 25 days after his receipt of the Respondents' answer or motion to dismiss to file a written response. the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, electronically via a Notice of Electronic Filing to the United States Attorney's Office, Western District of New York. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 6/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (mailed a copy of this order to petitioner)(TF)
June 3, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Consent form, privacy notice and civil case timelime mailed to petitioner. (TF)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shah MD Imran Kader. FILING FEE PAID, receipt #BUF064544, $5.00(TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kader v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shah MD Imran Kader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Feeley
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferey Searls
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: United States Attorney's Office (e-service)
Represented By: Adam A. Khalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?