Gilbert v. DNF Associates LLC
Plaintiff: Cassandra Gilbert
Defendant: DNF Associates LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv06436
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Defendant's unopposed letter request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Defendant now has until August 30, 2019 to do so. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/23/2019. (AFM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DNF Associates LLC. (Little, Brendan)
July 1, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Whitbeck on behalf of DNF Associates LLC (Whitbeck, Scott)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan H. Little on behalf of DNF Associates LLC (Little, Brendan)
June 18, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
June 18, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DNF Associates LLC. (JHF)
June 18, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DNF Associates LLC $ 400 receipt number 0209-3488679, filed by Cassandra Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons)(Kaplan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. DNF Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNF Associates LLC
Represented By: Brendan H. Little
Represented By: Scott J. Whitbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Gilbert
Represented By: David M. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?