N. et al v. Rochester City School District et al
Plaintiff: T. G., N. N., A. H., Y. R. and T. W.
Defendant: The Board of Education of the Rochester City School District and Rochester City School District
Case Number: 6:2019cv06526
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 10/3/2019 11:00 AM before Hon. David G. Larimer. (PR)
September 5, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 9/18/2019 03:30 PM before Hon. David G. Larimer. (PR)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. David G. Larimer: Status Conference held on 9/5/2019. Status Conference set for 9/19/2019 02:30 PM before Hon. David G. Larimer. (PR)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl W. Kristoff on behalf of All Defendants (Kristoff, Karl)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Status Conference set for 9/4/2019 02:30 PM before Hon. David G. Larimer. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 8/19/19. (PR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 8/19/19. (PR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Rochester City School District, The Board of Education of the Rochester City School District. Defendants have no opposition to the motion. (PR)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison K. L. Moyer on behalf of All Defendants (Moyer, Alison)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by T. G., A. H., N. N., Y. R., T. W. re #2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. W., N. N., A. H., T. G., Y. R.. Rochester City School District served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T. W., N. N., A. H., T. G., Y. R.. The Board of Education of the Rochester City School District served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
July 16, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (JHF)
July 16, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rochester City School District, The Board of Education of the Rochester City School District. (JHF)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. David G. Larimer. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Maggie R. Robb on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Robb, Maggie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by T. G., A. H., N. N., Y. R., T. W. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maggie R. Robb in Support of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rochester City School District, The Board of Education of the Rochester City School District ($400 receipt number 0209-3521528), filed by T. W., N. N., A. H., T. G., Y. R. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Nussbaum, Carolyn) Modified on 7/16/2019 (JHF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. et al v. Rochester City School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. G.
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Represented By: Maggie R. Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. N.
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Represented By: Maggie R. Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. H.
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Represented By: Maggie R. Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. R.
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Represented By: Maggie R. Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. W.
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Represented By: Maggie R. Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Education of the Rochester City School District
Represented By: Karl W. Kristoff
Represented By: Alison K. L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester City School District
Represented By: Karl W. Kristoff
Represented By: Alison K. L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?