White v. Five Points Corr Facility et al
Plaintiff: Aditep S. White
Defendant: OMH-Service, Five Points Corr Facility and ICP-Program
Case Number: 6:2019cv06546
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of #8 to "Letter and Response" to clarify the filing event. (JHF)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aditep S. White. (JHF)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aditep S. White. (JHF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Letter and Response from Aditep S. White, dated 7/27/19, to Clerk. Received for docketing on 8/14/19. (JHF) Modified on 8/16/2019 (JHF).
July 30, 2019 Copy of #4 Order, #5 Judgment and an in forma pauperis motion form and authorization form mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT administratively closing this action. Signed by Clerk on 7/30/19. (JHF)
July 30, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Clerk corrected docket text of #4 ORDER to show that #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis was denied, not deferred. (JHF)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk directed to administratively close this case. If Plaintiff wants to reopen this action, he must submit a complete in forma pauperis motion and signed authorization form or $400.00 in filing fees by 8/30/19. If Plaintiff timely submits a proper motion or the filing fees, the Clerk will reopen this case. Clerk directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion form and authorization form. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/30/19. (JHF) Modified on 7/30/2019 (JHF).
July 22, 2019 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
July 22, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by US Marshal by Aditep S. White. (JHF)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aditep S. White. (JHF)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Five Points Corr Facility, ICP-Program, OMH-Service, filed by Aditep S. White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Five Points Corr Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMH-Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Points Corr Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICP-Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aditep S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?