Dawson v. Supt. of Five Points Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Lavon Dawson
Defendant: Supt. of Five Points Correctional Facility, C.O. "A" and C.O. "B"
Case Number: 6:2019cv06547
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lavon Dawson. (BK)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Request from Lavon Dawson, dated 7/30/2019. (BK)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 7/29/2019. A copy of this judgment has been mailed to the Plaintiff at Fishkill Correctional. (BK)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/26/2019. This action shall be administratively terminated. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall notify the Court, in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this order. The writing must include a properly supported IFP motion along with the required certification on Plaintiff's inmate trust fund account or pay the $400.00 filing fee. A copy of this order along with a blank IFP form motion with supporting affirmation has been mailed to the Plaintiff at Fishkill Correctional. (BK)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lavon Dawson. (BK)
July 22, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. The Pro Se Packet including: the Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and the Civil Case Timeline have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (BK)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lavon Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Supt. of Five Points Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supt. of Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. "B"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavon Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?