Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. Wafa Ali Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A. and Oakley, Inc.
Defendant: Ali Saleh, Does 1-10, inclusive, Wafa Ali Inc. and Carmelo Gimeli
Case Number: 6:2019cv06582
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Referring Judge: Marian W Payson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2019 11:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/3/2019. (KAH)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ali Saleh, Wafa Ali Inc. (TF)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. against Ali Saleh. (Blakely, Brent)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 9/26/19. (JMC)
September 23, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TF)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carmelo Gimeli.(Witmer, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.. Ali Saleh served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Covington, Jessica)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.. Carmelo Gimeli served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Covington, Jessica)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.. Wafa Ali Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Covington, Jessica)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carmelo Gimeli, Ali Saleh, Wafa Ali Inc.. (TF)
August 9, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
August 9, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
August 9, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
August 8, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400, receipt number 0209-3546339 (TF)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oakley, Inc. for Luxottica Group S.p.A... (Blakely, Brent)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover & Summons)(Blakely, Brent)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, inclusive, Carmelo Gimeli, Ali Saleh, Wafa Ali Inc., filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc..(Blakely, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. Wafa Ali Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Represented By: Brent Herbert Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Herbert Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wafa Ali Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmelo Gimeli
Represented By: Michael Jos. Witmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?