Blodywon v. Bellnier et al
Plaintiff: Zhordrack Blodywon
Defendant: T. Miller, Joseph Bellnier, C. Roberts, NYSDOCCS and Jeff McKoy
Case Number: 6:2019cv06658
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04757.
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER, Case transferred to District of Western District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of thisTransfer Order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by thetransferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This Transfer Order closes this case, and the provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules for the Eastern District of New York, which requires a seven-day delay in the transfer of relevant case materials, is waived. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in goodfaith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/3/2019. c/m (Galeano, Sonia) [Transferred from nyed on 9/6/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/6/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee - Prisoner Case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (as amended July 26, 1996), plaintiff/petitioner is proceeding in forma pauperis and must pay the total $350 fee by monthly installments deducted from plaintiffs/petitioners prison trust fund account (or institutional equivalent). Original letter sent to the Warden/Superintendent of Correctional Facility. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/6/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zhordrack Blodywon. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/6/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zhordrack Blodywon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blodywon v. Bellnier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bellnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYSDOCCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McKoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhordrack Blodywon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?