James v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Rose James
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 6:2019cv06692
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Case transferred from New York Western has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:19-cv-18843, filed 10/09/2019. (TF)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 10/4/19. (TF)
September 19, 2019 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action emailed to the MDL (TF)
September 19, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
September 19, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3591764, filed by Rose James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose James
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?