Maximiliano Gonzalez v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Jose Maximiliano Gonzalez
Respondent: Jeffrey Searls and William Barr
Case Number: 6:2019cv06699
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Case reassigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (LB)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Barr, Jeffrey Searls. (Coriell, David)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Answer and Return RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Barr, Jeffrey Searls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 2)(Coriell, David)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: This case is hereby reassigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca for further proceedings.SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/7/2019. A copy of this Text Order was mailed to Petitioner. (AFM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Coriell on behalf of William Barr, Jeffrey Searls (Coriell, David)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/24/2019. Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. By November 8, 2019, Respondents must file and serve an answer responding to the allegations in the Petition. Respondents must also file and serve a memorandum of law addressing each of the issues raised in the Petition. Instead of an answer, Respondents may file a motion to dismiss the Petition with appropriate exhibits demonstrating that an answer to the Petition is unnecessary. Petitioner will have 25 days after he receives Respondents answer or motion to dismiss to file a written response. Petitioner must forward a copy of all future papers and correspondence to the attorney who appears for Respondents. A copy of this order has been mailed to the Petitioner at the Buffalo Federal Detention Facility. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (BK)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose Maximiliano Gonzalez. (BK)
September 19, 2019 The Pro Se Packet including: the Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and the Civil Case Timeline have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (BK)
September 19, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Maximiliano Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maximiliano Gonzalez v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Searls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Maximiliano Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?