Williams vs. Barr, et al.,
Plaintiff: Jennifer Almarie Williams
Defendant: Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services, Attny Gen of US William P. Barr, Department of Justice, Director Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, DHS, William P. Barr, Commissioner Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services and BCIS, Buffalo, NY
Case Number: 6:2019cv06733
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 12/3/2019. Replies due by 12/10/2019. Motion will be submitted without oral argument on 12/18/2019 before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. No court appearances are required. (JMC)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss byBCIS, Buffalo, NY, William P. Barr, Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Field Office Director, DHS. (Coriell, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by BCIS, Buffalo, NY, William P. Barr, Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Field Office Director, DHS.(Coriell, David)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Coriell on behalf of All Defendants (Coriell, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (TF)
October 4, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
October 4, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix)(Pawar, Santosh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Judicial Reveiw and De Novo Hearing on Application for Naturalizatioin against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3609304, filed by Jennifer Almarie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix USCIS Denial Decision)(Pawar, Santosh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams vs. Barr, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attny Gen of US William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: David M. Coriell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: David M. Coriell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, DHS
Represented By: David M. Coriell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: David M. Coriell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: David M. Coriell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCIS, Buffalo, NY
Represented By: David M. Coriell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Almarie Williams
Represented By: Santosh K. Pawar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?